NV AJR13 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the Legislature to canvass the vote for certain elections and certify results of such elections.
Title
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the Legislature to canvass the vote for certain elections and certify the results of such elections. (BDR C-652)
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] | Rep. Jill Dickman [R] | Rep. John Ellison [R] | Rep. Andy Matthews [R] |
Rep. Philip O'Neill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7874/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AJR/AJR13.pdf |