NV AB9 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 430.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 430.
Summary
Creates the Legislative Committee on Senior Citizens, Veterans and Adults With Special Needs. (BDR 17-97)
Title
Creates the Legislative Committee on Senior Citizens, Veterans and Adults With Special Needs. (BDR 17-97)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 430. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-30 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-30 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-29 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | |
2009-05-29 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-06 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Do pass, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2009-03-23 | Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption. | |
2009-03-02 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-07 | From printer. | |
2008-12-02 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=32 |