NV AB85 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; creating the Independent Commission on Rates for Health Care Services; establishing procedures for fixing the rates charged by hospitals, independent centers for emergency medical care and surgical centers for ambulatory patients for certain goods and services provided to certain patients; authorizing the imposition of a civil penalty and initiation of disciplinary action against such a facility that fails to comply with provisions concerning rate fixing; creating certain causes of action to enforce those provisions; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes procedures to fix rates for certain health care goods and services. (BDR 40-169)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 267.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. |
2023-01-30 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |