NV AB79 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 146.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 146.
Summary
Revises provisions concerning city elections. (BDR 24-486)
Title
Revises provisions concerning city elections. (BDR 24-486)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 146. | |
2009-05-18 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-11 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | |
2009-04-13 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-09 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 182.) To printer. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-09 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=178 |