NV AB58 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 46.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 46.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Attorney General; authorizing the Attorney General to investigate whether a state governmental authority, any agent thereof or any person acting on behalf of a state governmental authority has engaged in certain patterns or practices that deprive persons of certain rights, privileges or immunities and file a civil action to eliminate such an identified pattern or practice in certain circumstances; establishing provisions relating to such an investigation; requiring the Attorney General to participate and cooperate in any investigation by the United States Department of Justice regarding whether the Office of the Attorney General has engaged in certain patterns or practices that deprive persons of certain rights, privileges or immunities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes changes relating to the authority and duties of the Attorney General. (BDR 3-417)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 46. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 78.) To printer. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |