NV AB554 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-953)
Title
Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-953)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (No further action taken.) | |
2011-04-15 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-15 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-06 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-03-30 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-28 | To printer. | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Committee on Education. | |
2011-03-28 | Action of referral rescinded. | |
2011-03-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/76th2011/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1141 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/76th2011/Bills/AB/AB554.pdf |