NV AB530 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 241.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 241.
Summary
Provides for the reversion of certain money in the Account for Programs for Innovation and the Prevention of Remediation to the State General Fund. (BDR S-1218)
Title
Provides for the reversion of certain money in the Account for Programs for Innovation and the Prevention of Remediation to the State General Fund. (BDR S-1218)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 241. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-20 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-20 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-18 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-16 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 721.) To printer. | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-06 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-04-03 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-04-02 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1062 |