NV AB520 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state financial administration; making appropriations from the State General Fund and the State Highway Fund for the support of the civil government of the State of Nevada for the 2023-2025 biennium; providing for the use of the money so appropriated; making various other changes relating to the financial administration of the State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes regarding state financial administration and makes appropriations for the support of the civil government of the State. (BDR S-1210)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Bill read with Governor's veto message. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |