NV AB510 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 576.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT making an appropriation to the Department of Motor Vehicles for the Automatic Voter Registration Initiative; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes an appropriation to the Department of Motor Vehicles for the Automatic Voter Registration Initiative. (BDR S-1190)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13AssemblyChapter 576.
2019-06-12AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-06-02SenateRead second time.
2019-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-06-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-09SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-07AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-04-30AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback