NV AB492 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Chapter 416.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Chapter 416.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations to the Legislative Fund for dues to national organizations. (BDR S-1239)
Title
Makes appropriations to the Legislative Fund for dues to national organizations. (BDR S-1239)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Chapter 416. | |
2011-06-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-06-13 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-05 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-05 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | Read second time. | |
2011-06-04 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-06-04 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-05-10 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2011-05-10 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-06 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-04 | Notice of exemption. | |
2011-03-30 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |