NV AB484 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the Commission on Postsecondary Education. (BDR 34-912)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Commission on Postsecondary Education. (BDR 34-912)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 513. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 900.) |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 153.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |