NV AB464 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the tax on special fuel. (BDR 32-1160)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the tax on special fuel. (BDR 32-1160)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 441. |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 3, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 798.) To printer. |
2013-05-25 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-05 | Assembly | Amended notice of eligibility: Exempt. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-27 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |