NV AB443 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 390.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes an appropriation to the Legislative Counsel Bureau for the cost of dues and registration for national organizations and one-time building maintenance and information technology purchases. (BDR S-1221)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes an appropriation to the Legislative Counsel Bureau for the cost of dues and registration for national organizations and one-time building maintenance and information technology purchases. (BDR S-1221)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-08AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 390.
2015-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-04AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-29SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2015-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-29AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-05-27AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 950.) To printer.
2015-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-24AssemblyNotice of exemption.
2015-03-24AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback