NV AB433 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands prohibition on employers taking certain actions to prohibit, punish or prevent employees from engaging in politics or becoming candidates for public office with certain exceptions. (BDR 53-63)
Title
Expands prohibition on employers taking certain actions to prohibit, punish or prevent employees from engaging in politics or becoming candidates for public office with certain exceptions. (BDR 53-63)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | To enrollment. | |
2011-06-06 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . | |
2011-06-06 | To printer. | |
2011-06-06 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2011-06-06 | From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 690 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | To committee. | |
2011-06-04 | Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | In Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | Senate Amendment No. 690 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Amendment No. 690 not concurred in. To Senate. | |
2011-05-31 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-29 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 690.) To printer. | |
2011-05-29 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | |
2011-04-26 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-22 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 280.) To printer. | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |