NV AB426 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344.
Summary
Requires the Division of Environmental Protection of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources to conduct a study concerning programs for reusing and recycling computers and other electronics. (BDR S-466)
Title
Requires the Division of Environmental Protection of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources to conduct a study concerning programs for reusing and recycling computers and other electronics. (BDR S-466)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-23 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. | |
2009-05-06 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-05 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2009-04-10 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-10 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-04-10 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-10 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-09 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 220.) To printer. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-09 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=814 |