NV AB414 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing agreements with certain governments for purposes of interactive gaming. (BDR 41-1072)
Title
Revises provisions governing agreements with certain governments for purposes of interactive gaming. (BDR 41-1072)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 17, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |