NV AB414 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 309.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 309.
Summary
Makes various changes to the requirements for emissions inspections of certain vehicles. (BDR 40-821)
Title
Makes various changes to the requirements for emissions inspections of certain vehicles. (BDR 40-821)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 309. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-20 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-15 | Rereferred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-10 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-01 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-04-01 | Taken from Second Reading File. | |
2009-03-31 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=802 |