NV AB394 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 190.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 190.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to civil actions; providing that behavioral health specialists performing mobile crisis intervention services are immune from civil liability under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides that behavioral health specialists performing mobile crisis intervention services are immune from civil liability under certain circumstances. (BDR 3-1046)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 190. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 662 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 662.) To printer. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 196.) To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |