NV AB380 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public utilities; declaring the policy of this State concerning statewide reductions in net greenhouse gas emissions; requiring a gas utility to submit at certain times an Infrastructure, Supply and Alternatives Plan; allowing for an accelerated cost recovery for certain infrastructure replacement projects; requiring the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to convene a public hearing on the Plan and to comply with certain requirements for such a hearing; requiring that all prudent and reasonable expenditures made by a gas utility to develop the Plan be recovered from rates charged to the customers of the gas utility; requiring the Commission to open an investigatory docket to examine the role of gas utilities in assisting the State in achieving its goal of reducing net greenhouse gas emission; requiring the Commission to prepare a report from the investigatory docket and transmit the report to the next regularly scheduled Legislative Session; repealing provisions authorizing a public natural gas utility to expand its infrastructure in certain situations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to utilities. (BDR 58-773)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-04-02 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7980/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB380.pdf |