NV AB372 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 128.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 128.
Summary
Makes various changes concerning registration of commercial motor vehicles. (BDR 43-1015)
Title
Makes various changes concerning registration of commercial motor vehicles. (BDR 43-1015)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 128. | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-08 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-04-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-17 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-16 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-16 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-14 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-13 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-10 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-09 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-06 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=728 |