NV AB371 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public records; requiring the person responsible for responding to public records requests for certain governmental entities to report for a temporary period certain information relating to requests for public records; requiring the Director of the Legislative Counsel Bureau to compile and provide that information to the Legislature and, upon request, a member of the public; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporarily requires the reporting of certain information relating to requests for public records by certain governmental entities. (BDR S-16)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 9, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 423.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback