NV AB351 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes program of grants to be used by teachers to make payments on educational loans. (BDR 34-653)
Title
Establishes program of grants to be used by teachers to make payments on educational loans. (BDR 34-653)
Sponsors
Rep. Ozzie Fumo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 304.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |