NV AB348 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to health care; transferring the Patient Protection Commission from the Office of the Governor to the Office of the Director of the Department of Health and Human Services; revising the membership and duties of the Commission; requiring the Commission to coordinate and administer certain assistance; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the Patient Protection Commission. (BDR 40-497)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 210.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2021-04-19AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-02AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-03-23AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback