NV AB345 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 189.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 189.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to drug paraphernalia; providing that it is not unlawful to provide, administer or use a testing product for certain purposes; exempting a person or entity acting in good faith and with reasonable care from professional discipline and civil liability for providing, administering or using a testing product for those purposes; excluding testing products from the list of drug paraphernalia that is prohibited for delivery, sale, possession, manufacture, advertising or use in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to drug paraphernalia. (BDR 40-978)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 189. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 584 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 584.) To printer. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 344.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |