NV AB338 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 51.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 51.
Summary
Authorizes a program to provide grants to nonprofit private entities concerning small business start-ups for veterans and senior citizens. (BDR 53-123)
Title
Authorizes a program to provide grants to nonprofit private entities concerning small business start-ups for veterans and senior citizens. (BDR 53-123)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 51. | |
2009-05-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-01 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-04-30 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-17 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-17 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 284.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption. | |
2009-03-16 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-03-16 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=669 |