NV AB327 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 188.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 188.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mental health; requiring certain mental health professionals to complete continuing education concerning cultural competency and diversity, equity and inclusion; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires certain mental health professionals to complete continuing education relating to cultural competency. (BDR 54-175)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 188. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 555 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 555.) To printer. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 243.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |