NV AB317 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing common-interest communities. (BDR 10-712)
Title
Revises provisions governing common-interest communities. (BDR 10-712)
Sponsors
Rep. Harvey Munford [D] | Rep. John Moore [R] | Rep. Michele Fiore [R] | Rep. David Gardner [R] |
Sen. Dina Neal [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Rep. Philip O'Neill [R] | Rep. Shelly Shelton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-11 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-01 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=668 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB317.pdf |