NV AB315 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Autism Treatment Assistance Program. (BDR 38-986)
Title
Establishes the Autism Treatment Assistance Program. (BDR 38-986)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (No further action taken.) | |
2011-04-18 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2011-04-18 | From committee: Do pass, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-04 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-03-21 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/76th2011/Reports/history.cfm?ID=659 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/76th2011/Bills/AB/AB315.pdf |