NV AB3 | 2020 | 32nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - In Assembly. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public safety; authorizing a person to record law enforcement activity in certain circumstances; revising provisions relating to the use of physical force by a peace officer; requiring a peace officer to intervene to prevent the use of unjustified physical force by another peace officer in certain circumstances and to report the observation of the use of unjustified physical force by another peace officer; requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt a written policy regarding the drug and alcohol testing of a peace officer in certain circumstances; providing that the newly effective provisions of law reducing the maximum period of probation or suspension of sentence that may be imposed upon a person apply to persons sentenced on or after July 1, 2020; requiring law enforcement agencies to provide a report to the Legislature containing certain information relating to traffic stops and other stops by law enforcement officers and the software used to process certain information during such traffic stops and other stops; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to public safety. (BDR 14-14)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2020-08-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.
2020-08-02SenateRead second time.
2020-08-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2020-08-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To committee.
2020-08-01SenateIn Senate.
2020-08-01AssemblyTo Senate.
2020-08-01AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2020-08-01AssemblyTo printer.
2020-08-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.)
2020-08-01AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2020-08-01AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 3.)
2020-08-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2020-08-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2020-08-01AssemblyTo committee.
2020-08-01AssemblyRereferred to Committee of the Whole.
2020-08-01AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2020-07-31AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2020-07-31AssemblyRead first time.
2020-07-31AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-07-30AssemblyTo printer.
2020-07-30AssemblyReferred to Committee of the Whole.
2020-07-30AssemblyPrefiled.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback