NV AB29 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to economic development; redesignating the Knowledge Account as the Nevada Innovation Account; requiring the Executive Director of the Office of Economic Development to establish a competitive grant program to provide grants for certain purposes related to the research and development of technology in this State; revising provisions governing commercialization revenue allocated between the Office, the research universities and the Desert Research Institute; revising the duties of the Executive Director; expanding the services that must be provided by a technology outreach program; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing programs for the development and commercialization of research and technology in this State. (BDR 18-256)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 256.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer. |