NV AB286 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 469.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 469.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; requiring a person who administers a county or city jail to establish a policy that ensures a person who is detained in the jail may register to vote and vote in an election; requiring the person who administers a county or city jail to submit a report to the Secretary of State after each election; prohibiting electioneering near certain areas of a jail; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-530)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Assembly | Chapter 469. |
2023-06-14 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 974 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 974.) |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 381.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |