NV AB283 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to law enforcement. (BDR 14-397)
Title
Revises provisions relating to law enforcement. (BDR 14-397)
Sponsors
Sen. Ira Hansen [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 621.) To printer. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 542.) To printer. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |