NV AB277 | 2011 | 76th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 352.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for special license plates honoring female veterans. (BDR 43-810)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for special license plates honoring female veterans. (BDR 43-810)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-13 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 352.
2011-06-06 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2011-06-05 To enrollment.
2011-06-05 Conference report adopted by Senate.
2011-06-04 From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 677. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
2011-06-03 To committee.
2011-06-03 Conference Committee appointed by Assembly.
2011-06-03 In Assembly.
2011-06-03 Senate Amendment No. 677 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
2011-06-02 In Senate.
2011-05-31 Senate Amendment No. 677 not concurred in. To Senate.
2011-05-31 In Assembly.
2011-05-30 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2011-05-30 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2011-05-29 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 677.) To printer.
2011-05-29 Placed on Second Reading File.
2011-05-29 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-04-27 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
2011-04-27 In Senate.
2011-04-26 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.
2011-04-26 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2011-04-25 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 316.) To printer.
2011-04-25 Placed on Second Reading File.
2011-04-25 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-03-16 From printer. To committee.
2011-03-15 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback