NV AB27 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to contractors; revising provisions governing cease and desist orders issued by the State Contractors' Board for acting as a contractor or submitting a bid on a job in this State without a license as a contractor; prescribing certain actions that the Board is required or authorized to take after issuance of such a cease and desist order; authorizing a person who is issued a cease and desist order by the Board to contest the order within a certain period; setting forth the circumstances under which the order shall be deemed a final order of the Board; authorizing the Board to extend the time to contest the order for good cause shown; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing cease and desist orders issued by the State Contractors' Board. (BDR 54-240)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 505.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |