NV AB256 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes relating to motorcycles. (BDR 43-661)
Title
Makes various changes relating to motorcycles. (BDR 43-661)
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Sen. Richard Daly [D] | Rep. Teresa Benitez-Thompson [D] | Rep. Andy Eisen [D] |
Rep. Michele Fiore [R] | Sen. Ira Hansen [R] | Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2013-05-25 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2013-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | To committee. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 131.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |