NV AB252 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 348.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 348.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mental health; revising the scope of community-based living arrangement services; imposing certain requirements relating to the operation of a provider of community-based living arrangement services; requiring a provider of community-based living arrangement services to reimburse the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services for certain overpayments to the provider; revising requirements concerning the issuance or renewal of a license to provide community-based living arrangement services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to providers of community-based living arrangement services. (BDR 39-656)
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Benitez-Thompson [D] | Rep. Maggie Carlton [D] | Sen. Ben Kieckhefer [R] | Sen. David Parks [D] |
Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 348. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 744 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 744.) To printer. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 254.) To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |