NV AB250 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to the Legislative Fund for the Legislative Committee on Public Lands to attend informational meetings and tours in Washington, D.C., during the 2019-2020 interim; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Legislative Fund for certain members of the Legislative Committee on Public Lands to attend informational meetings and tours in Washington, D.C., during the 2019-2020 interim. (BDR S-508)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Chapter 489. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1022.) To printer. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Notice of exemption. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |