NV AB243 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of justice; revising certain provisions relating to the sentences of offenders who are less than 21 years of age; authorizing a prosecutorial office to establish a system of race-blind charging to be used when determining whether criminal charges should be filed against a person; authorizing a district attorney to establish a system of race-blind charging to be used when determining whether a petition alleging delinquency of a child should be filed; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the administration of justice. (BDR 14-785)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 318.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |