NV AB243 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing designs of special license plates. (BDR 43-76)
Title
Revises provisions governing designs of special license plates. (BDR 43-76)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.) |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 7, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 328.) To printer. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |