NV AB237 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 506. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 506. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to and authorizing expenditures by the Division of Health Care Financing and Policy of the Department of Health and Human Services for certain costs relating to Medicaid; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation and authorizes expenditures for certain purposes relating to health care. (BDR S-328)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Assembly | Chapter 506. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | To printer. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 901.) |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 176.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-10 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |