NV AB235 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 241.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 241.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring the board of trustees of a school district and the governing bodies of certain charter and private schools to provide support and assistance to certain pupils and their parents and guardians in completing the Free Application for Federal Student Aid; requiring the board of trustees of a school district and the governing bodies of certain charter and private schools to report certain information to the State Treasurer; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Enacts provisions governing financial education for pupils and their parents and guardians. (BDR 34-42)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 241. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 301.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |