NV AB228 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; revising requirements relating to social studies courses in high school; requiring the adoption of certain regulations prescribing the requirements to receive a standard high school diploma; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing required courses in high school. (BDR 34-572)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 369.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-10 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |