NV AB218 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to public works. (BDR 28-981)
Title
Revises provisions relating to public works. (BDR 28-981)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2013-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 761 concurred in. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 761.) To printer. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 13, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 402.) To printer. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-03-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |