NV AB216 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 370.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 370.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to higher education; requiring the State Treasurer to establish a database of information relating to sources of funding for higher education; requiring the Attorney General to establish a program to connect victims of certain crimes with the database; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the establishment of a database of information relating to funding opportunities for higher education. (BDR 18-858)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 370. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | To committee. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 627.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 68.) To printer. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |