NV AB213 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; prohibiting the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada from fixing a tuition charge against certain students; providing that a student does not have to certify his or her citizenship or immigration status or complete the Free Application for Federal Student Aid to receive certain scholarships or grants; prohibiting certain college tuition and savings programs from excluding persons based solely on the citizenship or immigration status of the person or his or her family; authorizing the Board of Regents to use a percentage of appropriated money to administer the Silver State Opportunity Grant; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-242)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 199.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-18 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |