NV AB211 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employees; requiring, under certain circumstances, the Public Employees' Retirement Board to request the actuary of the Public Employees' Retirement System compute for certain members of the System the amount of money necessary to pay the full actuarial cost of converting retirement service credit to the Police and Firefighters' Retirement Fund; authorizing, under certain circumstances, certain public employers and employee organizations to engage in supplemental collective bargaining to allow certain law enforcement dispatchers to participate in the Fund and convert certain service credit to the Fund; requiring certain law enforcement dispatchers to successfully complete a program for the training of law enforcement dispatchers; revising provisions governing the sharing of information concerning applicants for certain positions with public safety agencies; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to law enforcement dispatchers. (BDR 23-750)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-15 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2023-03-10 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/9936/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/AB/AB211.pdf |