NV AB210 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 126.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 126.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to chiropractic; requiring a business entity that provides chiropractic services to register with the Chiropractic Physicians' Board of Nevada; establishing certain duties of a registrant; revising terminology used to refer to a person who provides chiropractic services; revising certain qualifications of an applicant for a license to engage in the practice of chiropractic; authorizing a chiropractic physician to recommend, dispense or administer certain drugs and devices; creating a privilege for confidential communication between a patient and a chiropractic physician; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the practice of chiropractic. (BDR 54-140)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Chapter 126. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 125 and 170.) To printer. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |