NV AB20 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 286.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 286.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing agriculture. (BDR 50-321)
Title
Revises provisions governing agriculture. (BDR 50-321)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-01 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 286. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | To committee. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Notice of exemption. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 126.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2012-12-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2012-12-19 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |