NV AB2 | 2020 | 31st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - No further action taken.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - No further action taken.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to large school districts; temporarily removing a requirement for the year-end balances of local school precincts in a large school district to be carried forward as a restricted fund balance; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Temporarily removes a requirement for year-end balances of certain local school precincts to be carried forward as restricted fund balances. (BDR S-17)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Assembly | No further action taken. |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Considered. |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/31st2020Special/Bill/7126/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/31st2020Special/Bills/AB/AB2.pdf |