NV AB198 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Legislative Committee on Public Lands to conduct a study concerning water conservation and alternative sources of water for Nevada communities. (BDR S-805)
Title
Requires the Legislative Committee on Public Lands to conduct a study concerning water conservation and alternative sources of water for Nevada communities. (BDR S-805)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 338. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Exempt pursuant to subsection 4 of Joint Standing Rule 14.6. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |